2.
Appointment to The DOWNTOWN RIDEAU BOARD OF MANAGEMENT NOMINATION AU CONSEIL DE GESTION DE RIDEAU CENTRE-VILLE |
COMMITTEE RECOMMENDATION
That Council
approve the appointment of Cindy Van Buskirk to the Downtown Rideau Board of
Management for the term expiring November 30, 2006.
RECOMMENDATION DU COMITÉ
Que le Conseil approuve la nomination de Cindy
Van Buskirk au conseil de gestion de Rideau Centre-Ville pour un mandat prenant
fin le 30 novembre 2006.
DOCUMENTATION
1.
Chief
Corporate Services Officer’s report dated 18 September 2006
(ACS2006-CRS-CCB-0055).
Report to/Rapport au :
Corporate Services
and Economic Development Committee
Comité des services organisationnels et du
développement économique
and Council/et au Conseil
18 September 2006 / le 18 septembre 2006
Submitted by/Soumis par: Greg Geddes, Chief Corporate Services
Officer /
Chef des Services généraux
Contact / Personne-ressource: Elaine Fleury, Manager / Gestionnaire
Council and Committee Services / Services au
Conseil et aux comités
RIDEAU-VANIER (12) |
|
Ref N°: ACS2006-CRS-CCB-0055 |
SUBJECT: Appointment to The DOWNTOWN RIDEAU BOARD OF
MANAGEMENT
OBJET : NOMINATION
AU CONSEIL DE GESTION DE RIDEAU CENTRE-VILLE
REPORT RECOMMENDATION
That the Corporate Services
and Economic Development Committee recommend Council approve the appointment of
Cindy Van Buskirk to the Downtown Rideau Board of Management for the term
expiring November 30, 2006.
Que le
Comité des services organisationnels et du développement économique recommande
au Conseil municipal d’approuver la nomination de Cindy Van Buskirk au conseil
de gestion de Rideau Centre-Ville pour un mandat prenant fin le 30 novembre
2006.
Section 204 of the Municipal Act,
2001 requires that the municipality appoint Business Improvement Area (BIA)
Board members.
By-law
Number 80-94 (amending By-law 199-81 and adopted by the Council of the former
City of Ottawa on 20 April 1994) states that the Downtown Rideau BIA Board of
Management shall consist of fifteen members appointed by Council, two of whom
shall be members of Council. On 17
December 2003, Council appointed Councillor Georges Bédard as its sole
representative to the BIA Board of Management, and on 11 February 2004, Council
appointed twelve business representatives to the Board of Management, as
recommended by the BIA.
In a letter dated 23 August 2006, the BIA requested the appointment of Cindy Van Buskirk, General Manager of the Rideau Centre to replace Robert Hasler, who recently retired.
Section 204
of the Municipal Act directs that Business Improvement Area Board
members shall hold office until the expiration of the term of Council that
appoints them. Therefore, Ms. Van Buskirk’s
term will expire on November 30, 2006.
The BIA undertakes consultation or
recruitment of members. This is an
administrative matter completed on behalf of the BIA, therefore public
consultation is not required.
There are no financial implications
related to this report.
Document 1 - Downtown Rideau
letter dated August 23, 2006, including biography of the recommended appointee,
is held on file with the City Clerk.
Upon approval of the report by
Council, the City Clerk will notify the Downtown Rideau Board of Management of
the appointment.